THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:19:57 PM
Hutspardol, Sakara
CPSO#:
99296
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
23 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Chulalongkorn University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
AVP - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 02 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 02 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2021 |