THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:08:57 PM
Leung, William Pui Hung
CPSO#:
99281
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Aug 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PUI HUNG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2014 |