THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:26:12 PM
Melamed, Nir
CPSO#:
99280
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynaecology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:28 Oct 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2012 to 17 Oct 2012
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Oct 2014
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Apr 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Apr 2024 |
|
Active |