THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:54:29 PM
AlAzzawi, Nihad Khalid Abbas
CPSO#:
99233
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 20 Aug 2012 to 02 Sep 2012
PEAP - R - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 03 Sep 2012 to 14 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 19 Nov 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2014 |