THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 19:05:08 PM
Qureshi, Shahab
CPSO#:
99226
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
03 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, Czech, English, German, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Universita Palackeho, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3045 William Cutmore Blvd
Oakville ON L6H 3S2
Phone: 2896962230
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
USA - Florida
USA - Washington
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Aug 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:01 Feb 2024 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Mar 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |