THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:36:27 PM
Walsh, Christopher James
CPSO#:
99189
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital - T2 Chest
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-7777 Ext. 3461
Fax: 416-469-7717
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:07 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 26 Aug 2012
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2014 |