THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:25:20 PM
Banks, Brie Ann
CPSO#:
99188
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kawartha Collaborative Surgical
272 Charlotte St, Suite 302
Peterborough, ON
K9J 2V4
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-874-5222
Fax: 1-705-874-5224
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIE ANN BANKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANKS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 Aug 2012 to 26 Aug 2012
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 27 Jan 2013 to 15 Feb 2013
EL - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2014 |