THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:17:51 AM
Danter, Matthew Robert
CPSO#:
99168
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
11 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Danter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Miranda Rieger or Jerusha Latuff
Administrative Assistants to Dr. R. Whitlock
Hamilton General Hospital
DBCVSRI C1-5B
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton, ON L8L 2X2
Telephone: 905-527-4322 extension 40306
Fax: 905-577-8017
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 25 Feb 2014
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New Mexico
USA - Tennessee
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2016 |