THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:59:07 AM
Fong, Bryan
CPSO#:
99161
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pacific Medical Clinic
Unit F33
4300 Steeles Avenue East
Markham ON L3R 0Y5
Phone: (905) 604-7889
Fax: (905) 604-7890
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRYAN FONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2014 |