THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:04:18 PM
Vakharia, Nina Kalpesh
CPSO#:
99110
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Gujarat University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: 416 946 2000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NINA KALPESH VAKHARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKHARIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 18 Oct 2012
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |