THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:46:15 AM
Ponoran, Tudor Arbore
CPSO#:
99054
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Cluj, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Jul 2012 to 03 Oct 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2016 |
|
Active |