THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:59:33 PM
Azevedo, Alexandre Mello de
CPSO#:
99052
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
12 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 10 Jul 2012 to 03 Sep 2012
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2012 to 12 Sep 2012
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Sep 2012 |