THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:38:24 PM
Rosenberg, Ellimelech
CPSO#:
99018
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
27 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Aug 2015
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2015 |