THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:01:42 PM
Nasr, Enas Nasr Ahmad
CPSO#:
99010
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 May 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Al Quds University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 May 2024 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Sep 2012
PEAP - CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2022 to 20 Dec 2022
PEAP - CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2024 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 May 2024 |
|
Active |