THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:00:57 PM
Marshall, Luke Alexander
CPSO#:
98995
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marshall & Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Date Received: 18 Mar 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jul 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Mar 2019 |