THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:30:39 AM
Jarbo, Ashraf
CPSO#:
98983
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ashraf Jarbo and Dr. Wijdan Fadholi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2023
Corporation Name: ASHRAF JARBO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHRAF JARBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARBO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2017 |