THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:57:40 AM
Albashir, Siwar Mazen
CPSO#:
98972
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Jordan, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4L6
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 74598
Fax: 905-526-0594
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:27 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:27 Oct 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIWAR MAZEN ALBASHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBASHIR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 2017 |