THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:08:27 PM
Patro, Satya Narayana
CPSO#:
98910
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Maharaja Krishna Chandra Gajapati Medica, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2016 |