THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:55:59 PM
Mahdi, Laith Mohamed
CPSO#:
98839
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Nova Southeastern University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2301 Highway 71
Emergency Department
Spirit Lake IA 51360-1185
United States
Phone: 712 336 1230
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mahdi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Docudavit at 1-888-781-9083. Paitents should ensure that they provide their full name to Docudavit when requesting their record
Date Received: 07 Sep 2018
Date Received: 12 Apr 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Iowa
USA - Minnesota
USA - Montana
USA - Nebraska
USA - South Dakota
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAITH MOHAMED MAHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHDI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2014 |