THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:55:07 PM
Sheppard, Matthew Gordon Clarence
CPSO#:
98813
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
103 Winnebago Street
oromocto NB E2V 1C6
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Sheppard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 24 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW GORDON CLARENCE SHEPPARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPPARD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2022 |