THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:50:37 AM
Drossos, Alexander Demetrios Apollo
CPSO#:
98807
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200-25 Main St W
McMaster Children's Hospital
Child & Youth Mental Health Program
3G-107
Hamilton ON L8P 1H1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 77255
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Feb 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER DEMETRIOS APOLLO DROSSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DROSSOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 24 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 25 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Feb 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2019 |