THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:33:20 AM
Bernstein, Erica Anne
CPSO#:
98803
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University College of Dublin, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
80 Thickson Rd S
Glen Hill Medical
Whitby ON L1N 7T2
Phone: 9056740455
Fax: 9056740480
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:04 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERICA ANNE BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 20 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2019 |