THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:14:44 AM
Bogach, Jessica Danielle
CPSO#:
98779
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession St
Juravinski Hospital
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100 x
Fax: 905-528-9388
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:23 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA DANIELLE BOGACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGACH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2016 |