THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:39:30 PM
Kalaichandran, Amitha
CPSO#:
98748
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
17 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Aug 2018 |