THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 4:07:53 AM
Ahadian, Ali
CPSO#:
98745
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand Genesis Eye Care Center
Suite 15, Level 2
9080 Yonge st.
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:07 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALI AHADIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHADIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2019 |