THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:21:50 PM
Ahmed, Sana Ara
CPSO#:
98736
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1138-12 Royal Vista Way NW
Calgary AB T3R 0N2
Phone: 587-600-8158
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sana-Ara Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 16 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANA ARA AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2012 |