THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:40:16 AM
Borowy-Borowski, Paul George
CPSO#:
98730
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Eastern Ontario Regional
Laboratory Association
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-8899
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL GEORGE BOROWY-BOROWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROWY-BOROWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |