THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:59:56 PM
Hontscharuk, Rayisa Stephanie
CPSO#:
98713
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
410-790 Bay St
Toronto Plastic Surgery
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: 4163236336
Fax: 4163236325
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAYISA STEPHANIE HONTSCHARUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONTSCHARUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2019 to 31 Oct 2019
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2019 |