THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:20:00 PM
Tikkanen, Jussi Matias
CPSO#:
98701
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Finnish, Swedish
Education: University of Helsinki, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jussi Tikkanen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto, Ontario
M5G2C4
Date Received: 10 Jun 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Finland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |