THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 22:12:49 PM
Labelle, Alexandre
CPSO#:
98687
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRE LABELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABELLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 01 Apr 2016
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |