THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:17:32 AM
Walsh, Sarah Kathleen
CPSO#:
98684
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON K2G 6E5
Phone: 613-228-4298
Fax: 613-228-9365
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH KATHLEEN WALSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |