THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:30:21 AM
Collins, Jovian Amanda Ehrlich
CPSO#:
98682
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
500 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Emergency Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-813-5807
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOVIAN AMANDA EHRLICH COLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2018 |