THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:35:40 PM
Esufali, Susmita
CPSO#:
98672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Markham Medical Center
6633 Highway 7 East, Suite 214
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSMITA ESUFALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESUFALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2015 |