THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:57:53 AM
Malak, Mariem Isabelle
CPSO#:
98670
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
116 Albert St
Ottawa ON K1P 5G3
Phone: 613-216-3932
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical record requests should be sent to:
210 Centrum Blvd
Orleans, ON
K1E 3V7
Phone: 613-837-5454
Date Received: 02 May 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIEM ISABELLE MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2015 |