THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 9:49:36 AM
Sawa, Kathryn
CPSO#:
98594
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 7R1
Phone: 519-740-2000
Fax: 519-740-2003
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Sawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 8 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN SAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 01 Oct 2018
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2017 |