THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:02:10 AM
Puentes Beltran, Wilfredo
CPSO#:
98546
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: National University of Colombia, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:10 Aug 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |