THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:09:54 PM
Omar, Ahmed Hadi Ali
CPSO#:
98520
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Room 2-029
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5332
Fax: (647) 689-7593
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Libya
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:01 Jul 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2026 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Oct 2020 |
|
Active |