THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:15:03 AM
Pickett, Laura Emily
CPSO#:
98517
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
145 Station St
Suite 205
Belleville ON K8N 2S9
Phone: 613-771-1910 Ext. 6
Fax: 613-707-0470
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:24 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURA EMILY PICKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICKETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 17 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 17 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2018 |