THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:13:32 PM
Afanasyeva, Marina Georgievna
CPSO#:
98514
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Belarusian State Medical University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-17345 Leslie St
Ministry of Labour, Immigration,
Training & Skills Development
Newmarket ON L3Y 0A4
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:25 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARINA GEORGIEVNA AFANASYEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFANASYEVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Occupational Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Occupational Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2019 |