THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:16:49 AM
Alavi-Tabari, Nika
CPSO#:
98513
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Nika Alavi-Tabari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIKA ALAVI-TABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVI-TABARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 12 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |