THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:21:09 AM
Plener, Ian Saul
CPSO#:
98473
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto, Ontario
M3M 0B2
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: 416-477-2318
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Jul 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:15 Jan 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IAN SAUL PLENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLENER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 16 Jul 2018
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2016 |