THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 4:27:54 AM
Bakewell, Francis William
CPSO#:
98440
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |