THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:48:23 AM
Ruppel, Rachel
CPSO#:
98367
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Vale, Rachel (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1243 Islington Ave
Etobicoke ON M8X 1Y9
Phone: (416) 231-0100
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:19 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL RUPPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPPEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2017 |