THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 23:33:58 PM
Moulton, Dagmar Trudy
CPSO#:
98225
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Department of Pediatric Anesthesiology
IWK Hospital
5850 - 5980 University Avenue
Halifax, NS B3K 6R8
Date Received: 25 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2014 |