THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:58:06 AM
Champion, Caitlin Elizabeth
CPSO#:
98194
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert St
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540 Ext. 3314
Fax: (705) 746-2282
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAITLIN ELIZABETH CHAMPION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPION is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |