THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:16:23 AM
Woolfson, Jessica Pearl
CPSO#:
98174
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Apr 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network Centenar
Department of Pediatrics
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:03 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA PEARL WOOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
EL - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2017 |