THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:01:08 PM
Agostino, Kevin David
CPSO#:
98150
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Emergency Department
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Fort Frances |
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital |
Nipigon |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jul 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN DAVID AGOSTINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGOSTINO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2021 to 29 Aug 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2014 |