THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:49:44 PM
Raghuram, Kamini
CPSO#:
98119
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Rm 19-231
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3331
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Developmental Pediatrics |
Effective:20 Sep 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAMINI RAGHURAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAGHURAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Mar 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 07 Feb 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 06 Aug 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2016 |