THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:28:27 PM
Dobkin, Karen Jennifer
CPSO#:
98082
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street
Suite 300
Vaughan ON L6A 3Z8
Phone: 289-269-1522
Fax: 905-303-9774
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jan 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN JENNIFER DOBKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBKIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2015 |