THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:34:18 PM
Strauss, Benjamin Jacob
CPSO#:
98073
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JACOB STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |